+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.523
- Rules Report Cal.523
- Reported
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4687c
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4687b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4687a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor