+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.60
- Signed Chap.745
On December 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.794
- Substituted For S4863a
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.154
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.180
- Rules Report Cal.180
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4677a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
May 23, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2