+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4658b
- Amend and recommit to real property taxation
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to real property taxation
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Held for consideration in real property taxation
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4658a
- Amend and recommit to real property taxation
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to real property taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor