+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.32
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.518
- Rules Report Cal.518
- Reported
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor