+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.766
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4624a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.198
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor