+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.347
- Signed chap.347
On September 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted for s2790a
- 3rd reading cal.248
- Passed senate
- Returned to assembly
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.190
- Rules report cal.190
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4614a
- Amend and recommit to transportation
On February 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor