+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.204
On October 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S3524
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On March 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.145
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1