+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4723a
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.380
- Rules Report Cal.380
- Reported
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4587a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On February 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments