+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On March 27, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.125
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On March 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 4587a
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.87
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions