+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to codes
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.207
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to codes
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.114
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to correction