+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.97
- Signed Chap.730
On December 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.722
- Substituted For S4316
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.130
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 24, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63