+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2984
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.342
- Rules Report Cal.342
- Reported
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor