+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.148
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.109
- Rules Report Cal.109
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary