+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.21
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5739a
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.484
- Rules Report Cal.484
- Reported
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 436a
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor