+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.183
- Rules Report Cal.183
- Reported
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor