+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held for consideration in ways and means
On February 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On January 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On February 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor