+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On March 26, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 43c
On May 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.187
On May 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 43b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 43a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On January 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor