+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 4286b
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.175
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 4286a
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.194
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor