+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.446
- Rules Report Cal.446
- Reported
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4285a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Health
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor