+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.116
- Rules Report Cal.116
- Reported
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4250a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Correction
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor