+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.595
- Rules report cal.595
- Reported
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amend by restoring to original print 4236
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4236a
- Amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to racing and wagering
On February 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to racing and wagering
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor