+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On February 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.369
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4189a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Election Law
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.253
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law