+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held for consideration in ways and means
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health