+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.115
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.62
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor