+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.376
On October 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S2300
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.306
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor