+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4124a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor