+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.335
On September 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1921
- Substituted For S8096
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On March 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.168
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.82
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor