+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 16, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Transportation
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.114
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.623
- Rules Report Cal.623
- Reported
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor