+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4254
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.203
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor