+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.432
On October 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.300
- Substituted for s3789
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On February 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.47
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - May 29, 2013
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
May 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - May 1, 2013
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor