+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.589
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Insurance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.166
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Rules Report Cal.336
- Reported
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.336
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4036a
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor