+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.439
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3966a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On January 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor