+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.600
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 3963a
- Amend and recommit to health
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
On January 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor