+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.27
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.170
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection