+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor