+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.5
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.283
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.473
- Substituted For S4475a
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.137
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.137
- Delivered To Senate
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3913a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor