+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
- Print Number 3894b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On February 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3894a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Judiciary
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor