+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.154
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.77
On February 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor