+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1189
- Substituted For S5535
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.29
On February 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.92
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor