+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.389
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 381a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.90
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor