+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3795b
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans' Affairs
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3795a
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans' Affairs
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On January 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor