+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4597
- Rules Report Cal.147
- Reported
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Judiciary
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On February 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments