+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.381
On October 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1048
- Substituted For S5589
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.74
- Rules Report Cal.74
- Reported
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 3771a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Libraries And Education Technology
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Libraries And Education Technology
+ − Vote
June 13, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1