+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor