+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.149
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.111
On March 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor