+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
On March 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.70
On February 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor