+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.321
On October 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.564
- Substituted For S1735
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.339
On May 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Vote
May 30, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor