+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 36b
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 36a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor