+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.277
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.143
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor