+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.23
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.445
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary